Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Berlendis

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹Born
6 Oct 165338.7AppointedBishop of Belluno, Italy
27 Dec 165338.9Ordained BishopBishop of Belluno, Italy
21 Oct 169378.8DiedBishop of Belluno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Berlendis
Bishop Giulio Berlendis (born 1615, died ) Bishop of Belluno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlzano Lombardo, Diocese of Bergamo
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Gloriosa dei Frari, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
Death PlaceAlzano Lombardo, Diocese of Bergamo
Buried Place (Original)Bergamo, Diocese of Bergamo

  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 112
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1653, Number 28
  • ob/c2+: AT, 30 Aug 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,465

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast