Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giiovanni Querini

Deceased

Archbishop of Candia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1594¹BornVenice
Sep 164450.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 164450.9AppointedArchbishop of Candia, Greece
15 Jan 164551.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Candia, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giiovanni Querini:
Archbishop Giiovanni Querini Archbishop of Candia

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 168
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 109, Number 663

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013