Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sebastiano Pisani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Verona

Titular Archbishop of Thessalonica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606¹BornVenice
1639²33.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 163933.9AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
27 Dec 163933.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ceneda, Italy
6 Oct 165347.7AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
9 Dec 166862.9ResignedBishop of Verona, Italy
14 Jan 166963.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
1670²64.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Verona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Pisani:
Archbishop Sebastiano Pisani , Bishop Emeritus of Verona

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 365, and Page 145
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 376, and Page 411
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015