Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Camponeschi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Dec 1644AppointedBishop of Termia (Thermae), Greece
15 Jan 1645Ordained BishopBishop of Termia (Thermae), Greece
8 May 1652SelectedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
22 Jun 1654ConfirmedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
1657DiedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Camponeschi
Bishop Giovanni Camponeschi O.F.M. (died 1657) Bishop of Mottola (Motula)

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 334, and Page 250
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 109, Number 663
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018