Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Federico Baldissera Bartolomeo Cardinal Cornaro

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1579BornVenice
23 Feb 162343.2AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
7 Apr 162343.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bergamo, Italy
19 Jan 162646.1Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 162646.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
7 Sep 162646.8AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
15 Nov 162747.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
26 Apr 162949.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
30 Apr 162949.4AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
11 Jun 163151.5AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
13 Jun 164464.5ResignedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
19 Nov 164667.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
29 Apr 165272.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
5 Jun 165373.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Federico Baldissera Bartolomeo Cornaro:
Federico Baldissera Bartolomeo Cardinal Cornaro (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

  • a bishop for 30.1 years
  • a cardinal for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jan 1626
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 20, and Page 113
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 79, Number 469
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 368, and Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015