Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Vercellino

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1586¹Born
Oct 162236.7SelectedBishop of Aosta, Italy
13 Feb 162337.1ConfirmedBishop of Aosta, Italy
14 May 162337.3Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
17 Mar 165165.2DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Vercellino
Bishop Giovanni Battista Vercellino (born 1586, died ) Bishop of Aosta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVercelli

  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 100
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 79, Number 470
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1623, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018