Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Ragni, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oppido Mamertina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1643BornNapoli
19 Feb 167430.5AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
4 Mar 167430.5Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
3 Dec 169350.2DiedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Ragni:
Bishop Vincenzo Ragni O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Oppido Mamertina

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 297

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013