Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Alberini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nicomedia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1625¹Born
15 Jan 167449.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
4 Mar 167449.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
10 Mar 167449.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
Nov 1675³50.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Savoy
9 Jul 167954.5DiedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Alberini
Archbishop Pietro Alberini (born 1625, died ) Titular Archbishop of Nicomedia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 288
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 6
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast