Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Henrici

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland

Titular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1597Born
162123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne, Switzerland
4 May 164850.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland
4 May 164850.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
11 Oct 164851.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chrysopolis in Arabia
19 Feb 166062.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Thomas Henrici
Bishop Thomas Henrici (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGent

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 150
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018