Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Franz von Schönau

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1619Born
15 Apr 164828.7Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
18 Sep 165132.1SelectedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
3 Mar 165333.6ConfirmedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
15 Jun 165333.9Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
30 Nov 165637.3DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Johann Franz von Schönau
Bishop Johann Franz von Schönau (born , died ) Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEnsisheim

  • a priest for 8.6 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 111
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1653, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018