Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Maranta

Deceased

Bishop of Tropea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1583³BornNapoli
7 Sep 163753.8AppointedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
20 Sep 163753.9Ordained BishopBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
24 Mar 165773.4SelectedBishop of Tropea, Italy
24 Sep 165773.9ConfirmedBishop of Tropea, Italy
26 Jan 166480.2DiedBishop of Tropea, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Maranta:
Bishop Carlo Maranta (died ) Bishop of Tropea

  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 212, and Page 347
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 99, Number 598

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013