Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Mandina, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tropea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582¹BornMelfi
11 Dec 163957.9SelectedBishop of Tropea, Italy
14 Jul 164260.5ConfirmedBishop of Tropea, Italy
31 May 164664.4DiedBishop of Tropea, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Mandina:
Bishop Benedetto Mandina C.R. (born 1582, died ) Bishop of Tropea

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 347
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015