Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Giordani, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Aug 1637AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
20 Sep 1637Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia, Italy
11 Feb 1640DiedBishop of Isernia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Giordani
Bishop Domenico Giordani O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Bishop of Isernia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSte. Marie in Ara Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 211
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 99, Number 598
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 24
  • c2: AT, 20 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017