Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aniello Campagna

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1607¹BornNapoli
6 Mar 164538.1AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
19 Mar 164538.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
Jan 164841.0DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aniello Campagna:
Bishop Aniello Campagna , Bishop of Nusco

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 263
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015