Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pomponio Spreti

Deceased

Bishop of Cervia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595¹BornRavenna
8 Jan 164651.0AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
14 Jan 164651.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cervia, Italy
15 Nov 1652³57.8DiedBishop of Cervia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pomponio Spreti:
Bishop Pomponio Spreti (died ) Bishop of Cervia

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 146
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015