Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donato Pascasio, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trevico


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Apr 1646AppointedBishop of Trevico, Italy
22 Apr 1646Ordained BishopBishop of Trevico, Italy
13 Feb 1664DiedBishop of Trevico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Donato Pascasio:
Bishop Donato Pascasio O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Trevico

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 346
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015