Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ercole Coppola

Deceased

Bishop of Nicotera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1603Born
22 May 165148.2AppointedBishop of Nicotera, Italy
29 May 165148.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nicotera, Italy
1658¹54.8DiedBishop of Nicotera, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ercole Coppola
Bishop Ercole Coppola (born , died 1658) Bishop of Nicotera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGallipoli
Ordained BishopChiesa Nuova, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 260
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 14
  • ob/c2+: AT, 8 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018