Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pier Luigi Carafa, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jan 1646AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
14 Jan 1646Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
7 Aug 1672DiedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pier Luigi Carafa:
Bishop Pier Luigi Carafa C.R. (died ) Bishop of Tricarico

  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 237
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015