Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio degli Albizzi

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹Born
5 Jul 165545.5AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
11 Jul 165545.5Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
30 Jan 167666.0DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Orazio degli Albizzi (VIAF: 65654342)
Bishop Orazio degli Albizzi (born 1610, died ) Bishop of Volterra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopGes¨, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 372
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,655, Number 11
  • ob/c2: AT, 25 Dec 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,157
  • c34: AT, 11 Mar 2019
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast