Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maxmilián Rudolf Schleinitz

Deceased

Bishop of Litoměřice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹BornWarnsdorf
6 May 163025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
5 Jul 165550.5AppointedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
11 Jul 165550.5Ordained BishopBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
13 Oct 167570.7DiedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maxmilián Rudolf Schleinitz (VIAF: 17566972)
Bishop Maxmilián Rudolf Schleinitz (born 1605, died ) Bishop of Litoměřice

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 222
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Dec 2016