Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ascanio Maffei

Deceased

Archbishop of Urbino, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Jun 1646AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
1 Jul 1646Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
Oct 1659³DiedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Maffei
Archbishop Ascanio Maffei (died Oct 1659) Archbishop of Urbino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopBorghese Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 353
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 10
  • c34: AT, 18 Oct 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017