Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Imperato

Deceased

Bishop of Vico Equense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1596¹BornNapoli
27 May 164751.4AppointedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
2 Jun 164751.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
7 Oct 165660.8DiedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Imperato:
Bishop Tommaso Imperato (died ) Bishop of Vico Equense

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 367
  • ob/c2+: CB, 4 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013