Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Roche

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹Born
29 Apr 162440.3AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
25 Apr 162743.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
9 Apr 163652.3DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Roche:
Bishop John Roche (died ) Bishop of Ferns

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 186
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 88, Number 527

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013