Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Sgombrino

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619¹Born
11 Dec 165233.9AppointedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
29 Dec 165233.9Ordained BishopBishop of Belcastro, Italy
8 Feb 167253.1AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
Oct 1686³67.7DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Sgombrino
Bishop Carlo Sgombrino (born 1619, died Oct 1686) Bishop of Catanzaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAriola, Diocese of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
Ordained BishopSan Iganzio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 149
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 112
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 35
  • c3: AT, 18 Oct 2016
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018