Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Ambrogio Bicuti

Deceased

Bishop of Acqui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1607BornAcqui
27 May 164739.5AppointedBishop of Acqui, Italy
2 Jun 164739.5Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
10 Mar 167567.3DiedBishop of Acqui, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Ambrogio Bicuti:
Bishop Giovanni Ambrogio Bicuti (born , died ) Bishop of Acqui

  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 89
  • ob/c2+: CB, 4 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013