Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso d’Aquino, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹Born
8 Feb 164864.1SelectedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
24 Aug 164864.6ConfirmedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
20 Sep 164864.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
1651²67.0DiedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso d’Aquino
Bishop Tommaso d’Aquino C.R. (born 1584, died 1651) Bishop of Mottola (Motula)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 250
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 111, Number 680
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018