Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Pavonelli, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1602¹BornCivitella del Tronto
18 May 164846.3AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
24 May 164846.3Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
23 Sep 165351.7DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pavonelli:
Bishop Antonio Pavonelli O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Bishop of Venosa

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 364
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015