Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Bonafaccia

Deceased

Bishop of Terni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1612Born
3 Feb 165340.8AppointedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
9 Feb 165340.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
27 May 167563.1AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
18 Oct 168371.5DiedBishop of Terni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Bonafaccia
Bishop Carlo Bonafaccia (born , died ) Bishop of Terni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 115, Number 703
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 266
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1653, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018