Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Cantelmo

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1645Born
27 Sep 168338.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
3 Oct 168338.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
18 Apr 168539.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
8 Nov 168742.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
10 Dec 168742.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
15 Oct 168944.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
Dec 1689²44.4AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
13 Feb 169044.6Elevated to Cardinal
10 Apr 169044.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
27 Sep 169045.2AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
23 Jul 169146.1AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
11 Dec 170257.4DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Cantelmo (VIAF: 36909048)
Giacomo Cardinal Cantelmo (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli
Ordained BishopS. Andrea della Valle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
  • a cardinal for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Feb 1690
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 19
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 237

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast