Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sergio Pola

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Famagusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1674Born
24 May 169823.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 170631.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
Nov 1706³32.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Famagusta
8 Feb 174873.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
9 Feb 174873.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Famagusta

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sergio Pola
Bishop Sergio Pola (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Famagusta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTreviso, Diocese of Treviso, Italy
Ordained BishopPadova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy
Death PlaceTreviso, Diocese of Treviso, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santa Caterina, Church, Treviso, Diocese of Treviso, Italy

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 198
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 31
  • ob/c23: AT, 8 Sep 2017
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,470

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018