Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ascanius Gonzaga

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Colossae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1654Born
28 Aug 171258.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 172267.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colossae
6 Sep 172268.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Colossae

MicroData Summary for Ascanius Gonzaga
Archbishop Ascanius Gonzaga (born ) Titular Archbishop of Colossae

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantova

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 164
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 30
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast