Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Francesco Cardinal Barbarigo

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1658BornVenice
21 Jul 169840.2AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
17 Aug 169840.3Ordained BishopBishop of Verona, Italy
9 Jul 171456.2AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
29 Nov 171961.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
30 Sep 172062.4Elevated to Cardinal
20 Jun 172163.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
20 Jan 172364.7AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
26 Jan 173071.7DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Barbarigo:
Cardinal Giovanni Francesco Barbarigo (born , died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

  • a bishop for 31.4 years
  • a cardinal for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1719
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013