Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Martinengo

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Brescia

Titular Bishop of Martyropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1668BornBrescia
3 Aug 169224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
19 Oct 171143.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brescia, Italy
19 Oct 171143.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
21 Dec 171143.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
25 Mar 174677.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Martinengo:
Bishop Francesco Martinengo (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brescia

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,862
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 259
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,464
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,581

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013