Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo della Torre

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1657Born
30 Jan 168931.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Apr 168931.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 170244.7AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
19 Mar 170244.8Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
25 Feb 171759.8DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo della Torre
Bishop Filippo della Torre (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCividale

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 69
  • ob/c2: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018