Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Maria Carlini, O.P. †

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Corinthus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1658BornVenice
20 Dec 168123.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Nov 168224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
11 Dec 170244.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
24 Jun 170344.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
26 Jun 172465.6DiedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Carlini:
Archbishop Angelo Maria Carlini O.P. (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Corinthus

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 173
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 Jun 2015