Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Augustinus Ripa

Deceased

Bishop of Vercelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624¹BornTurin
27 Nov 167955.9AppointedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
30 Nov 167955.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vercelli, Italy
3 Nov 1691³67.8DiedBishop of Vercelli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Victor Augustinus Ripa:
Bishop Victor Augustinus Ripa (born 1624, died ) Bishop of Vercelli

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 410
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1679, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015