Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Giberti

Deceased

Bishop of Fano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹BornCamerino
15 Feb 168351.1AppointedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
21 Feb 168351.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
17 Dec 169664.9AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
26 Nov 172088.9DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Giberti:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Giberti (born 1632, died ) Bishop of Fano

  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 152, and Page 198
  • c34: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1683, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015