Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Annibale de Pietropaulo

Deceased

Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1623BornParghelia
4 Nov 164623.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 168460.3AppointedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
16 Jan 168460.3Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
8 Sep 170581.9DiedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Annibale de Pietropaulo:
Bishop Annibale de Pietropaulo (born , died ) Bishop of Castellammare di Stabia

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 149
  • c34: CB, 1 Jun 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015