Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferdinando Strozza

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Tarsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1652BornRoma
27 Mar 169037.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Mar 169037.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 169037.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
4 Jun 169037.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
Jun 169542.6DiedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Strozza:
Archbishop Ferdinando Strozza (born , died Jun 1695) Titular Archbishop of Tarsus

  • a priest for 5.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 369
  • c34: CB, 21 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015