Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Martelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1633Born
8 Sep 167542.6Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 167542.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
15 Sep 167542.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
15 Sep 167542.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
Dec 1680³47.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
21 Jul 169865.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
17 May 170673.3Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 170673.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
28 Sep 171784.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Martelli (VIAF: 89065627)
Francesco Cardinal Martelli (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Silvestro, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Agostino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Family's Chapel, Ss. Michele e Gaetano, Firenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
  • a cardinal for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,484
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,222
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 28
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018