Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Spinelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1657BornAquaro Feudo
19 Nov 169740.9AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
8 Dec 169740.9Ordained BishopBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
Oct 172467.8DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Spinelli:
Bishop Antonio Spinelli C.R. Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1724
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 265
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013