Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Maria Porfiri (Porfirius)

Deceased

Bishop of Alife, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1650¹Born
19 Mar 170050.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Mar 170050.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 170353.1AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
11 Mar 170353.1Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
23 Jul 173080.5DiedBishop of Alife, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Porfiri (Porfirius)
Bishop Angelo Maria Porfiri (Porfirius) (born 1650, died ) Bishop of Alife

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamerino, Diocese of Camerino
Ordained BishopSant’Ignazio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlacePiedimonte Matese, Diocese of Alife
Buried Place (Original)Ave Gratia Plena, Church, Piedimonte Matese, Diocese of Alife

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 79
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 34
  • ob/c2: AT, 16 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast