Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Valerio Martorelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montefeltro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1664Born
5 Mar 170338.7AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
11 Mar 170338.7Ordained BishopBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
18 Nov 172460.4ResignedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
28 Mar 173873.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Montefeltro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Valerio Martorelli (VIAF: 32337801)
Bishop Pietro Valerio Martorelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montefeltro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsimo, Diocese of Osimo
Ordained BishopSant’Ignazio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 200
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 33
  • ob/c2: AT, 16 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 17 Aug 2020

Quantcast