Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-François-Xavier de Belzunce de Castelmoron

Deceased

Bishop of Marseille


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1670BornPrigonrieux la Force
5 Apr 170938.3SelectedBishop of Marseille, France
19 Feb 171039.1ConfirmedBishop of Marseille, France
30 Mar 171039.3Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
4 Jun 175584.4DiedBishop of Marseille, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-François-Xavier de Belzunce de Castelmoron:
Bishop Henri-François-Xavier de Belzunce de Castelmoron (born , died ) Bishop of Marseille

  • a bishop for 45.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 260
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015