Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Baptiste-Antoine de Brancas

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1693BornPernes
25 Apr 172532.0SelectedBishop of La Rochelle, France
5 Sep 172532.3ConfirmedBishop of La Rochelle, France
21 Oct 172532.5Ordained BishopBishop of La Rochelle, France
14 Jun 172936.1SelectedArchbishop of Aix, France
17 Aug 172936.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix, France
30 Aug 177077.3DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Antoine de Brancas:
Archbishop Jean-Baptiste-Antoine de Brancas (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix

  • a bishop for 44.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 93, and Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015