Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-François de Cadenet de Charleval

Deceased

Bishop of Agde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1710BornAix
12 Jun 174030.2SelectedBishop of Agde, France
30 Sep 174030.5ConfirmedBishop of Agde, France
27 Nov 174030.7Ordained BishopBishop of Agde, France
22 Jan 175948.8DiedBishop of Agde, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-François de Cadenet de Charleval:
Bishop Joseph-François de Cadenet de Charleval (born , died ) Bishop of Agde

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 69
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1740, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015