Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Bareau de Girac

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rennes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1730BornAngoulême
6 Aug 176636.5AppointedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
31 Aug 176636.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
26 Dec 176939.9SelectedBishop of Rennes, France
25 Jan 177040.0ResignedBishop of Saint-Brieuc, France
12 Mar 177040.1ConfirmedBishop of Rennes, France
180170.9ResignedBishop of Rennes, France
29 Nov 182090.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Rennes, France

MicroData Summary for François Bareau de Girac:
Bishop François Bareau de Girac (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rennes

  • a bishop for 54.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 130, and Page 354

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013