Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin-René-Louis Le Mintier

Deceased

Bishop of Tréguier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1729BornSévignac
20 Mar 178050.2AppointedBishop of Tréguier, France
30 Apr 178050.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tréguier, France
21 Apr 180171.3DiedBishop of Tréguier, France

MicroData Summary for Augustin-René-Louis Le Mintier:
Bishop Augustin-René-Louis Le Mintier (born , died ) Bishop of Tréguier

  • a bishop for 21.0 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013