Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Joseph de Lubersac

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chartres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1740BornLubersac
9 Apr 177535.2SelectedBishop of Tréguier, France
17 Jul 177535.5ConfirmedBishop of Tréguier, France
6 Aug 177535.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tréguier, France
6 Feb 178040.0SelectedBishop of Chartres, France
15 Mar 178040.1ResignedBishop of Tréguier, France
20 Mar 178040.1ConfirmedBishop of Chartres, France
2 Feb 180262.0ResignedBishop of Chartres, France
30 Aug 182282.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Joseph de Lubersac:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Joseph de Lubersac (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chartres

  • a bishop for 47.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 148, and Page 414

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015