Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Auguste Frétat de Sarra

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1726BornSarra
22 Aug 177347.5SelectedBishop of Tréguier, France
20 Dec 177347.8ConfirmedBishop of Tréguier, France
23 Jan 177447.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tréguier, France
9 Apr 177549.1SelectedBishop of Nantes, France
26 Jun 177549.3ResignedBishop of Tréguier, France
11 Sep 177549.5ConfirmedBishop of Nantes, France
20 Sep 178357.6DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Auguste Frétat de Sarra: VIAF:66561468
Bishop Jean-Auguste Frétat de Sarra (born , died ) Bishop of Nantes

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 301, and Page 414

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015